Zeni, Deborah Ruth (CPSO#: 31921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1A Princess Anne Drive
suite 201
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Phone: (905) 873-3013
Fax: (905) 873-3018
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D&P Zeni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Zeni ( CPSO# 31921 )
Dr. P. Zeni ( CPSO# 31904 )

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1A Princess Anne Drive
Suite 201
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Phone Number: (905) 873-3013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Uganda

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH RUTH ZENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZENI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1980