Zerny, Cedric John (CPSO#: 15873)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Feb 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1943

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1955 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Feb 1988

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Jan 1987
Summary:

 In January 1987, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Zerny guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Zerny's 
 licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months.  It was also ordered that a 
 restriction be placed on the Doctor's licence such that he be prohibited from practicing at any 
 hospital, such restriction to take effect on the date of commencement of the suspension.  The 
 Committee ruled that should this Order become final on or before the first day of March, 1987, 
 then the final two months of the period of suspension would themselves be suspended.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 19 Jan 1987