Zetaruk, Merrilee Nicolette (CPSO#: 67268)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1993
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 2008