Zevallos, Gonzalo Fernando (CPSO#: 65833)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Aug 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Costa Rica, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 876-3881
Fax: (905) 876-0794
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Peru

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 17 Aug 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Aug 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Aug 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Gonzalo Fernando Zevallos may practise obstetrics and gynaecology
                  independently in an office based practice, only. 

            2.    Dr. Zevallos may also practise as a surgical assistant.