Zgjani, Muhamed Ali (CPSO#: 76489)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universiteti i Tiranes, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Apr 2001 to 15 Apr 2002
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Apr 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002