Zhang, Edwin Meng (CPSO#: 107309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
Room AG-46
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4339
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite S.2.749
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: (905) 494-6614
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edwin Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Zhang ( CPSO# 107309)

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite AG-46
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4339

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Suite s.2.749
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWIN MENG ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2016