Zhang, Euan (CPSO#: 101130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: Zhang, Zhen Yuan (used until: 30 Sep 2013 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
800 Commissioners Road East
Room C2 144
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 19006
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUAN ZHANG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ZHANG is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. ZHANG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ZHANG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ZHANG shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ZHANG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ZHANG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018