Zhang, Joyce Chenzi (CPSO#: 105915)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Internal Medicine
Room D-470A
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5744
Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Joyce  Chenzi  Zhang  shall  practise  medicine  as  required by the
                  postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. Zhang is  enrolled at
                  the University of Toronto.

            (2)   In  Dr.  Zhang's  practice in the postgraduate medical education program,
                  Dr. Zhang shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a
                  clinical teaching unit  that  is  formally affiliated with the department
                  where Dr. Zhang is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate
                  trainees are regularly assigned by  the department as part of its program
                  of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In Dr. Zhang's practice in the postgraduate  medical  education  program,
                  Dr. Zhang shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr.  Zhang  may  practise  internal  medicine  and  to  the extent of her
                  employment at the following locations:

                  (a)   St.  Michael's Hospital, while under supervision coordinated  by  a
                        supervisor acceptable to the College; and
                  
                  (b)   Women's  College Hospital, while under supervision coordinated by a
                        supervisor acceptable to the College. 
                  
            (5)   In Dr. Zhang's practice  specified  in  paragraph  (4), Dr. Zhang may not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This  certificate of registration expires, and Dr. Zhang  must  thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when  Dr.  Zhang is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when Dr. Zhang  no  longer  holds  Canadian  citizenship, permanent
                        resident  status,  or  a valid employment authorization  under  the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically   converts  to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education certificate and Dr.  Zhang  must immediately cease all practice
                  outside the postgraduate medical education  program  if  any  one  of the
                  following occurs:

                  (a)   the  supervisors identified in paragraph (4) notify the College  of
                        any concerns  regarding  Dr.  Zhang's  practice,  including but not
                        limited  to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,  skill,  judgment   or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the  supervisors  are  no  longer  able  or  willing to continue to
                        supervise Dr. Zhang's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   Zhang  to  engage  in  practice   outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when  Dr. Zhang's employment as specified in paragraph (4)  ceases;
                        or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr.  Zhang  takes  a  leave  of absence, or transfers to another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate education  program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In  the  event  of  conversion  to   a   regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7) or expiry  of  the  certificate  under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Zhang  may not  resume  any  practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education  program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Zhang  applies  for  a  new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2017.  In accordance with paragraph
                  6(a),  this  certificate of registration expires on June 30,  2019.   All
                  practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice  outside   the   postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.