Zhang, Kenny Jian (CPSO#: 68869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga ON  L5N 2Y1
Phone: (905) 567-9911
Fax: (905) 567-9011
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenny J. Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zhang ( CPSO# 68869 )

Business Address:
102 - 6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga ON  L5N 2Y1
Phone Number: (905) 567-9911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNY JIAN ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1997