Zhang, Phil Xu (CPSO#: 98170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4548
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Emergency Department
Mississauga Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Queensway Urgent Care
Trillium Health Partners
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416)-259-6671
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Phil Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zhang ( CPSO# 98170 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4530

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHIL XU ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2014