Zhang, Pingchuan (CPSO#: 87653)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Beijing Medical University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2007 to 23 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009