Zhang, Tracy Lan-Zhu (CPSO#: 104384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  18 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Canada
Phone: (519) 426-0130
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRACY LAN-ZHU ZHANG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ZHANG is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. ZHANG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ZHANG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ZHANG shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ZHANG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ZHANG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 18 Dec 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Dec 2017