Zhang, Xiaoling (CPSO#: 110831)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Chengdu Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

China

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2017