Zhang, Ying (CPSO#: 83421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview Family Physicians
Suite 203
9160 Bayview Ave
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E6
Phone: 905-889-7997
Fax: (905) 889-2666
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ying Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Zhang ( CPSO# 83421 )

Business Address:
Bayview Family Physicians
Suite 203
9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E6
Phone Number: (905) 889-7997

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Mar 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YING ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2008