Zhang, Yu (CPSO#: 78802)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Wenzhou Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Jan 2003 to 17 Feb 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 18 Feb 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 11 Aug 2008 to 11 Nov 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Nov 2008