Zhang, Yujie Jackie (CPSO#: 80558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Sun Yat Sen University of medical Scienc, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8
9019 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3M6
Phone: (905) 889-0062
Fax: (905) 889-9685
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

N01T/Durham College
Campus Health Centre
2000 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Canada
Phone: (905) 721-3037
Fax: (905) 721-3133
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Mar 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YUJIE JACKIE ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Mar 2004 to 11 Jun 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jun 2004 to 28 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Mar 2005 to 28 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2006