Zhao, Ying Ying (CPSO#: 88379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7-55 Frid Street
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3
Phone: (905) 529-2259
Fax: 905-529-2262
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2300 Eglinton Ave West, Suite 201
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Canada
Phone: 9059977277
Fax: 9059971860
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

303-1835 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-792-9436
Fax: 416-792-9438
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Y. Zhao & J. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Zhao ( CPSO# 88379 )
Dr. J. Wong ( CPSO# 84428 )

Business Address:
55 Frid Street
Suite 7
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 529-2259

Business Address:
1835 Yonge Street
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 792-9436

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
DBCVSRI C3 - 13C
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 09 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YING YING ZHAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012