Zhao, Yunwei (CPSO#: 105061)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 06 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2016