Zheng, Stanley Min (CPSO#: 68214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
3420 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2R6
Phone: (416) 497-8818
Fax: (416) 497-8848
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zheng ( CPSO# 68214 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
3420 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2R6
Phone Number: (416) 497-8818

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANLEY MIN ZHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996