Zhong, Toni (CPSO#: 77575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
8N 871 Eaton Wing North Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3858
Fax: (416) 340-4403
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Toni Zhong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Zhong ( CPSO# 77575 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Eaton's Wing
8N871 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3858

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TONI ZHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2008