Zhou, Alysia Weijia (CPSO#: 97364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 8
65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone: (705) 324-9404
Fax: (705) 324-1944
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alysia Zhou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zhou ( CPSO# 97364 )

Business Address:
Suite 8
65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone Number: (705) 324-9400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALYSIA WEIJIA ZHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHOU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Mar 2012 to 12 Apr 2012
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2013 to 26 Sep 2013
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Oct 2013 to 22 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2015