Zhu, Jiajia (CPSO#: 96742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West London Family Health Clinic
Suite 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: (519) 641-6712
Fax: (519) 641-6189
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jiajia Zhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zhu ( CPSO# 96742 )

Business Address:
200 - 785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712


Corporation Name: Dixon Fox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cunningham-Dunlop ( CPSO# 103184)
Dr. D. Martyniak ( CPSO# 93596 )
Dr. B. Yemchuk ( CPSO# 51884 )
Dr. P. Fox ( CPSO# 57143 )
Dr. D. Dixon ( CPSO# 65384 )
Dr. G. Abdel Malek ( CPSO# 86844 )
Dr. F. Sargolzaei ( CPSO# 93341 )
Dr. Y. Li ( CPSO# 95285 )
Dr. B. Choudhary ( CPSO# 96892 )
Dr. J. Zhu ( CPSO# 96742 )

Business Address:
West London Family Health Clinic
Unit 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JIAJIA ZHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2011 to 02 Oct 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012