Zhu, Susan Xiaohan (CPSO#: 102951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: Zhu, Xiaohan (used until: 30 Oct 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
566 Louise St
Winchester ON  K0C2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan X Zhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zhu ( CPSO# 102951)

Business Address:
16 Yoho Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 2J2
Phone Number: (647) 884-9449

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN XIAOHAN ZHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2017