Zhuk, Arkadii Abraham (CPSO#: 30285)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Nov 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Nov 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Latvian, Polish, Portuguese, Russian, Ukrainian, Yiddish

Education:Latvian State University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 2003

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Jan 2003
Summary:

 On January 16, 2003, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Zhuk(s plea of no contest and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct with respect to disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional 
 conduct and ordered the following:

1)	That Dr. Zhuk attend before the Discipline Committee to be 
 reprimanded and the fact of 	the reprimand be recorded on the register.

2)	The Registrar shall be 
 directed to suspend Dr. Zhuk(s certificate of registration for a 	period of (3) three months.  The 
 suspension shall itself be suspended provided Dr. Zhuk	successfully completes, at his own expense, 
 an ethics course approved by the College to 	the satisfaction of the Registrar within a period of 
 (12) twelve months from the date of the 	order; and makes the cost payment in paragraph 3 of this 
 order wihin 60 days of the date 	of the order, and otherwise to impose the suspension on January 
 16, 2004.

3)	The Discipline Committee orders that Dr. Zhuk pay costs to the College in the amount 
 of 	$5,000.00 within 60 days of the order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 13, 2003