Zhuk, Mark (CPSO#: 70623)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2004