Zibdawi, Labib Ahmad Abdallah (CPSO#: 57394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6596
Fax: (905) 952-2818
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Labib A. Zibdawi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Zibdawi ( CPSO# 57394 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LABIB AHMAD ABDALLAH ZIBDAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIBDAWI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1988