Ziedenberg, Robert Wilfred (CPSO#: 23830)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services 111 St. Regis Cres S Toronto, ON M3J 1X6
Date Received: 09 May 2017


Address: RSRS Canada 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Email: info@rsrs.com
Date Received: 02 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017