Ziegler, Wilfried Hermann (CPSO#: 23398)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 37 The Kingsway Toronto ON M8X 2S9
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016