Ziesmann, Markus Tyler (CPSO#: 102925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markus Ziesmann
3-074 Donnelly Wing, 30 Bond Street
St Michaels Hospital
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416 864 5284
Fax: 416 864 5218
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARKUS TYLER ZIESMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIESMANN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2014 to 27 Jun 2014
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016