Zifko, Udo Anton (CPSO#: 68722)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Vienna, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jan 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1996