Ziino, Adrian Joseph Anthony (CPSO#: 79987)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 10 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2012