Zijlstra, Folkert Gerben (CPSO#: 55476)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 18 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Nov 1998