Zikman, Jerrold Malcolm (CPSO#: 23530)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jerrold Zikman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 414 Victoria Avenue Hamilton ON L8L 5G8
Instructions: c/o Dr. M. Greenspan
Date Received: 25 Apr 2017


Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017