Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Zikman, Sharon Laurie (CPSO#: 64965)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
533 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A8
Phone: (416) 949-3041
Fax: (416) 323-1925
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Zikman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zikman ( CPSO# 64965 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
533 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 949-3041

Business Address:
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 333-1751

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON LAURIE ZIKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIKMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993