Zilberman, Harold (CPSO#: 65999)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian

Education:Laval University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 2005