Zildzic, Enisa (CPSO#: 93448)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3865 Lake Shore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8W0A2
Phone: 416-354-2640
Fax: 647-729-2008
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

128 Queen Street South, Unit 4A
Mississauga ON  L5M1K8
Canada
Phone: 905-997-7712
Fax: 905-997-7714
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ENISA ZILDZIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZILDZIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 02 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2015