Zimmer, Rudolf Andrew Gerard (CPSO#: 58232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 1988


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Richmond Square Medical Centre
#142 - 3715 - 51st Street SW
Calgary AB  T3E 6V2
Phone: (403) 229-2273
Fax: (403) 246-9688
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Harm Reduction, Fifth Floor
Sheldon M Chumir Health Centre
1213 - 4th Street SW
Calgary AB  T2R 0X7
Phone: (403) 955-6791
Fax: (403) 955-6818
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. RUDOLF ANDREW GERARD ZIMMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIMMER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1988