Zinman, Howard Mark (CPSO#: 54565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
299 Lincoln Street
Worcester MA  01605
United States
Phone: (508) 856-0200
Fax: (508) 856-0222

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD MARK ZINMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZINMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Research Fellows - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1985