Zioutas, Dimitrios (CPSO#: 85319)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 20 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 29 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2007