Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Zipursky, Robert Baruch (CPSO#: 51886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton,
100 West 5th Street, Room G247
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36250
Fax: (905) 381-5607
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Zipursky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 5 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT BARUCH ZIPURSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIPURSKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986