Zirkle, Molly Shaw (CPSO#: 80510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Yale University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Floor 8
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5187
Fax: (416) 864-5469
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 09 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOLLY SHAW ZIRKLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIRKLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2007