Ziter, Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 12724)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:St. Joseph's University, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1948
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Sep 1982
Summary:

 In September 1982, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Ziter guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found 
 guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice.  Consequently, the Committee ordered 
 that Dr. Ziter be reprimanded, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of 
 thirty days.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 13 Sep 1982