Zlatescu, Magdalena Cecilia (CPSO#: 91932)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2009 to 24 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2009 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2010 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2015