Zlot, Zoe Anne (CPSO#: 64337)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Aug 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 1998