Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Zmijowskyj, Timothy John (CPSO#: 66875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Noojmowin Teg Health Centre
48 Hillside Road, AOK
Postal Bag 2002, Hwy 540
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Phone: (705) 368-2182
Fax: (705) 368-2229
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tim Zmijowskyj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Zmijowskyj ( CPSO# 66875 )

Business Address:
Noojmowin Teg Health Centre
48 Hillside Road
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 368-2182

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN ZMIJOWSKYJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZMIJOWSKYJ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995