Zoberman, Lawrence (CPSO#: 23616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
tower 6
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 3615
Fax: (416) 431-8166
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrence Zoberman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 7 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE ZOBERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOBERMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1971