Zohoor, Arash (CPSO#: 84525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4th Floor
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone: (519) 756-6400
Fax: (519) 756-7343
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arash Zohoor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zohoor ( CPSO# 84525 )

Business Address:
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone Number: (519) 756-6400

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Business Address:
Willett Urgent Care
238 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2N7
Phone Number: (519) 442-2251

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARASH ZOHOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOHOOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008