Zolis, Lynne Ruddy (CPSO#: 80713)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: Tortorelli, Lynne Ruddy (used until: 19 Jul 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Yonge/York Mills Women's Clinic
Suite 100
36 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M2P 2E9
Phone: (416) 644-1404
Fax: (416) 644-1406
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zolis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Zolis ( CPSO# 80713 )

Business Address:
100 - 36 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M2P 2E9
Phone Number: (416) 644-1404

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNNE RUDDY ZOLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOLIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010