Zorn, Marietta Louise Theresa (CPSO#: 52179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Court Health Centenary Centre
2863 Ellesmere Road
Suite 413
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 283-5871
Fax: (416) 283-5875
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Cumberland Clinic
Renaissance Court
Suite 225
162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2X9
Canada
Phone: (416) 283-5871
Fax: (416) 283-5875
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Zorn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zorn ( CPSO# 52179 )

Business Address:
The Court Health Centenary Centre
Suite 413
2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 283-5871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIETTA LOUISE THERESA ZORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZORN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1984