Zouev, Alexandr (CPSO#: 102194)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Kemerovo State Medical Academy, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Rouge Valley Health System Centenary Site 2867 Ellesmere Road Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Date Received: 29 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Apr 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Feb 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017